Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tim Anker Wermuth | 01.04.1998 | 30.09.1998 | direktion |
Annette Gabrielle Wermuth | 01.06.1997 | 01.04.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tim Anker Wermuth | 01.06.1997 | 30.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Ole Rosdahl | 01.06.1997 | 30.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Annette Gabrielle Wermuth | 01.06.1997 | 01.04.1998 | bestyrelse |