Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karl Peter Søndergaard Lyngesen | 28.12.1996 | 07.06.2000 | direktion |
Jan Kjærulf-Møller | 01.04.1978 | 28.12.1996 | direktion |
Jørgen Kristensen | 01.04.1978 | 01.05.1995 | direktion |
Benny Curt Hansen | 01.04.1978 | 15.02.1995 | direktion |
Poul Erik Køpke | 01.04.1978 | 28.06.1994 | direktion |
Arne Vilhelm Petersen | 01.04.1978 | 06.06.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Kjærulf-Møller | 01.04.1978 | 28.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Elsebil Kjærulf-Møller | 01.04.1978 | 28.12.1996 | formand |
Jørgen Kristensen | 01.04.1978 | 18.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Benny Curt Hansen | 01.04.1978 | 18.01.1996 | formand |
Hans Jørgen Vestergaard Hansen | 01.04.1978 | 15.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kristensen | 01.04.1978 | 15.02.1995 | bestyrelse |