Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Petersen | 10.02.2000 | 16.05.2001 | adm. dir |
Kristian Schaaf | 01.04.1997 | 10.02.2000 | direktør |
Sandor Oturai | 04.03.1997 | 01.04.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Petersen | 14.01.1999 | 16.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Arne Olsen | 04.03.1997 | 16.05.2001 | formand |
Arne Voergaard Poulsen | 04.03.1997 | 16.05.2001 | næstformand |
Jørn Juul Petersen | 04.03.1997 | 14.01.1999 | bestyrelse |