Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Bech-Pedersen | 19.10.2009 | 16.05.2011 | direktion |
Carsten Bode | 01.01.1997 | 19.10.2009 | direktion |
John Bode | 01.01.1997 | 20.05.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Mielke | 19.10.2009 | 16.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Per Jensen | 19.10.2009 | 16.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Svend Rieks Hartmann | 19.10.2009 | 16.05.2011 | formand |
Nicolai Brian Liebach Bode | 20.03.1997 | 19.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Bode | 01.01.1997 | 19.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Ole Michael Vixø | 01.01.1997 | 19.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Axel Hagdrup | 01.01.1997 | 13.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
John Bode | 01.01.1997 | 20.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Ann Mari Bode | 01.01.1997 | 20.05.2002 | bestyrelse |