Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Christian Melskens | 31.01.1997 | 30.09.2014 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Jensen | 02.04.2006 | 30.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jan William Melskens | 02.04.2006 | 30.09.2014 | formand |
Jesper Schertiger | 16.06.2003 | 02.04.2006 | bestyrelse |
Lisa Markfoged | 28.06.2001 | 16.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lena Laurberg Jensen | 01.03.2000 | 28.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Morten Anderskov | 01.03.2000 | 28.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Tajanna Zenia Nielsen | 01.04.1998 | 01.03.2000 | næstformand |
Erik Hovgaard | 18.08.1997 | 01.03.2000 | formand |
Jens Carsten Nielsen | 18.08.1997 | 01.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Erik Rasmussen | 18.08.1997 | 01.04.1998 | formand |
Thomas Christian Melskens | 31.01.1997 | 30.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jimmy Olsen | 31.01.1997 | 18.08.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jan William Melskens | 31.01.1997 | 18.08.1997 | formand |