Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Jens Stoltenborg | 18.12.1996 | 29.09.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mette Lysdal Stoltenborg | 25.08.2014 | 29.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Ingvard Sand | 11.11.2009 | 29.09.2015 | formand |
Anders Osvald Hertzberg | 02.03.2006 | 08.02.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jens Woge Davidsen | 01.09.1999 | 25.08.2014 | bestyrelse |
Allan Jens Stoltenborg | 18.12.1996 | 29.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Bent Kjærgaard Skytte | 18.12.1996 | 11.11.2009 | formand |
Allan Louis Thomsen | 18.12.1996 | 01.09.1999 | bestyrelse |