Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacob Fritsch | 19.11.2001 | 19.05.2011 | direktion |
Marcello Piccioli | 22.06.1998 | 19.11.2001 | direktion |
Jacob Fritsch | 11.02.1997 | 22.06.1998 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1996 | 11.02.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Fritsch | 09.08.2007 | 19.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Peter Hedegaard | 14.06.2007 | 09.08.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Fritsch | 11.04.2003 | 19.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Morten Fritsch | 11.04.2003 | 19.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Arli Friis Sharif | 11.04.2003 | 14.06.2007 | formand |