Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Orla Jensen | 16.12.1998 | 14.06.1999 | direktion |
Finn Kristiansen | 30.04.1998 | 16.12.1998 | direktion |
Hagen Ødum | 28.02.1997 | 30.04.1998 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1996 | 28.02.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Orla Jensen | 16.12.1998 | 14.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Svend Frederiksen | 30.04.1998 | 14.06.1999 | formand |
Finn Kristiansen | 30.04.1998 | 16.12.1998 | bestyrelse |
Lars Frederiksen | 28.02.1997 | 14.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Lasse Andreassen | 28.02.1997 | 30.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Per Stobbe | 28.02.1997 | 30.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hagen Ødum | 28.02.1997 | 30.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Ole Plougmann | 28.02.1997 | 30.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.11.1996 | 28.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1996 | 28.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1996 | 28.02.1997 | formand |