Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent-Charly Henning Hansen | 17.10.1996 | 30.05.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Simon Løffler | 16.09.2003 | 30.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Hannah Løffler Schmidt | 18.12.2002 | 16.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Bent-Charly Henning Hansen | 17.10.1996 | 30.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Marianne Løffler | 17.10.1996 | 30.05.2005 | formand |
Marousca Helqvist | 17.10.1996 | 18.12.2002 | bestyrelse |