Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Martin Berg Jølnov | 31.10.1996 | 17.09.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Woller Skals | 04.03.2013 | 17.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Bent Christensen Aagaard | 04.03.2013 | 17.09.2014 | formand |
Preben Næsgaard | 14.08.1997 | 04.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Martin Berg Jølnov | 31.10.1996 | 17.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Elisabeth Vaaben Funck | 31.10.1996 | 14.08.1997 | bestyrelse |