Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Husted | 21.06.2001 | 06.01.2004 | direktion |
Kim Filt | 01.10.1997 | 20.04.1999 | direktion |
Niels Erik Ihler Jensen | 22.11.1996 | 21.06.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Zinck | 06.11.2001 | 06.01.2004 | bestyrelse |
Niels Husted | 21.06.2001 | 06.01.2004 | bestyrelse |
Hans Peter Lüdeking | 21.06.2001 | 06.01.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jens Asbjørn Knudsen | 21.06.2001 | 06.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Niels Erik Ihler Jensen | 29.03.2000 | 21.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Leo Larsen | 29.03.2000 | 21.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jan Mainz | 29.03.2000 | 21.06.2001 | bestyrelse |