Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Herman Mathiasen | 07.08.1996 | 28.04.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Thyrrestrup | 21.05.2003 | 28.04.2009 | formand |
Anna Marie Zætteberg Mathiasen | 01.07.1999 | 01.08.2005 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Herman Mathiasen | 07.08.1996 | 28.04.2009 | bestyrelse |