Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Thrane-Møller | 30.10.2009 | 31.12.2014 | adm. dir |
Jakob Bjørn Andersson | 02.09.2004 | 30.10.2009 | direktion |
Finn Jørn Jakobsen | 01.08.2003 | 02.09.2004 | direktion |
Per Skov Jensen | 29.08.1996 | 01.08.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Østergaard | 12.11.2004 | 19.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
John Kenneth Simonsen | 12.11.2004 | 19.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Gert Andersson | 02.09.2004 | 26.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Bjørn Andersson | 02.09.2004 | 26.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Ole Juul Møller | 02.09.2004 | 26.05.2005 | formand |
Michael Vinther | 31.05.2000 | 01.08.2003 | formand |
Claus Høxbro | 02.10.1998 | 01.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Per Skov Jensen | 29.08.1996 | 01.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Finn Jørn Jakobsen | 29.08.1996 | 31.05.2000 | formand |
Svend Erik Jensen | 29.08.1996 | 02.10.1998 | bestyrelse |