Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Zahid Butt | 26.11.1997 | 07.01.1998 | direktion |
Johnnie Max Adelby | 17.10.1997 | 26.11.1997 | direktion |
Jens Bering Petersen | 20.12.1996 | 17.10.1997 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.09.1996 | 20.12.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Benny Ravn | 26.11.1997 | 09.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Bjarke Mønsted Laursen | 26.11.1997 | 07.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Zahid Butt | 17.10.1997 | 07.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Martin Bo Kristensen | 17.10.1997 | 26.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Amstrup Willer | 20.12.1996 | 26.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Kim Johnny Fuchs | 20.12.1996 | 17.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ditte Elnegaard Haddaoui | 20.12.1996 | 17.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.09.1996 | 20.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.09.1996 | 20.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.09.1996 | 20.12.1996 | bestyrelse |