Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Preben Rossel Scheel | 25.08.2005 | 18.02.2019 | direktion |
Tonny Orloff | 10.04.2003 | 18.02.2019 | direktion |
Ole Mikkelsen | 15.05.1999 | 10.04.2003 | direktion |
Rune Serigstad | 19.11.1996 | 15.05.1999 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1996 | 19.11.1996 | direktion |