Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1996 | 13.12.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Korsgaard | 16.02.2004 | 21.03.2005 | næstformand |
Jan Meldgaard Christensen | 08.12.1997 | 16.02.2004 | næstformand |
Niels Pallisgaard Iversen | 13.12.1996 | 21.03.2005 | formand |
Svend Mørup | 13.12.1996 | 08.12.1997 | næstformand |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1996 | 13.12.1996 | bestyrelse |