Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Cedervall | 04.10.1996 | 23.08.2002 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1996 | 04.10.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Cedervall | 04.10.1996 | 23.08.2002 | bestyrelse |
Per de Fries Andreasen | 04.10.1996 | 13.02.1998 | formand |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1996 | 04.10.1996 | bestyrelse |