Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Gunnar Jensen | 01.12.2013 | 01.06.2016 | adm. dir |
Herman Teering | 14.03.2008 | 01.06.2016 | direktion |
Finn Calmar Clausen | 10.05.2004 | 01.12.2013 | adm. dir |
Niels Madsen | 31.05.1999 | 10.05.2004 | direktion |
Karsten Skov | 02.06.1996 | 01.08.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Andreas Kraskow | 07.12.2005 | 14.06.2006 | formand |
Arne Sommer Boesen | 10.05.2004 | 07.12.2005 | formand |
Finn Calmar Clausen | 02.05.2001 | 14.06.2006 | bestyrelse |
Inge Thorup | 31.05.1999 | 02.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Niels Madsen | 02.06.1996 | 10.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Skov | 02.06.1996 | 31.05.1999 | bestyrelse |