Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Rømer | 15.06.2010 | 25.06.2014 | bestyrelse |
René Ravn | 31.03.2010 | 21.04.2017 | formand |
Kim Sonne | 31.03.2010 | 15.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Svend Palle Nielsson | 28.05.2008 | 21.04.2017 | bestyrelse |
James Jensen | 17.05.2002 | 28.05.2008 | formand |
Asger Amby Lehmann | 28.04.2000 | 31.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Svend Palle Nielsson | 28.04.2000 | 25.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Walther Oppenlænder | 28.04.2000 | 17.05.2002 | formand |
John Rømer | 12.12.1995 | 27.04.2000 | formand |