Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Olsen | 15.10.1996 | 05.11.1999 | direktion |
Anette Birch | 03.07.1996 | 15.10.1996 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.04.1996 | 02.07.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Lindberg | 15.12.1998 | 31.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Søren Bonde | 15.10.1996 | 15.12.1998 | bestyrelse |
Michael Olsen | 07.08.1996 | 05.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Karen Marie Birch | 03.07.1996 | 31.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Anette Birch | 03.07.1996 | 15.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Ovesen | 03.07.1996 | 07.08.1996 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.04.1996 | 02.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.04.1996 | 02.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.04.1996 | 02.07.1996 | bestyrelse |