Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Folkersen | 10.10.2003 | 15.03.2004 | direktion |
Erik Folkersen | 17.11.2000 | 01.08.2003 | adm. dir |
Poul Sachmann | 10.06.1997 | 17.11.2000 | direktion |
Georg Styrbro | 01.03.1996 | 10.06.1997 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1996 | 27.06.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Frederik Bergh-Hansen | 10.10.2003 | 15.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Erik Folkersen | 10.10.2003 | 15.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Sørensen | 10.10.2003 | 15.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Legardt Blume Levy | 10.10.2003 | 15.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Peter Høstgaard-Jensen | 10.10.2003 | 15.03.2004 | formand |
Hanne Legardt Blume Levy | 26.03.2002 | 01.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Erik Folkersen | 17.11.2000 | 01.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Sørensen | 17.11.2000 | 01.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Peter Høstgaard-Jensen | 17.11.2000 | 01.08.2003 | formand |
Niels Frederik Bergh-Hansen | 17.11.2000 | 01.08.2003 | næstformand |
Jesper Bjarne Haugaard | 17.11.2000 | 26.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Mortensen | 30.04.1998 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Krøyer | 30.04.1998 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Egon Stenholdt Søgaard Poulsen | 30.04.1998 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Martin von Huth Smith | 30.04.1998 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Povl Erik Hansen | 30.04.1998 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Ravnholt Würtz | 30.04.1998 | 17.11.2000 | formand |
Erik Flemming Frisgaard Pedersen | 30.04.1998 | 17.11.2000 | næstformand |
Jørn Ravnholt Würtz | 30.04.1998 | 30.04.1998 | formand |
Erik Flemming Frisgaard Pedersen | 30.04.1998 | 30.04.1998 | næstformand |
Finn Lunde | 10.06.1997 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jens Bahne Jørgensen | 01.03.1996 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Verner Dalskov | 01.03.1996 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Svend Erik Hansen | 01.03.1996 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Leif Henriksen | 01.03.1996 | 17.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jens Arbjerg Pedersen | 01.03.1996 | 30.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Erling Bjerre | 01.03.1996 | 30.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Larsen | 01.03.1996 | 30.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Ejner Buch Schmidt | 01.03.1996 | 30.04.1998 | næstformand |
Villy Haahr Pedersen | 01.03.1996 | 10.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Tage Kristian Jespersen | 01.03.1996 | 10.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.03.1996 | 27.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1996 | 27.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.03.1996 | 27.06.1996 | formand |