Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Stanley Robinson | 01.11.1995 | 23.05.2001 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1995 | 27.12.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anette Faber Robinson | 01.11.1995 | 23.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Barnekow Nielsen | 01.11.1995 | 23.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Stanley Robinson | 01.11.1995 | 23.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Tvermoes | 01.11.1995 | 04.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.11.1995 | 27.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1995 | 27.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1995 | 27.12.1995 | formand |