Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Carl Bøgh-Sørensen | 31.08.2006 | 01.04.2014 | adm. dir |
John Morell Frellsen | 10.12.2004 | 23.05.2007 | direktion |
Ragnhild Birgitte Jensen | 01.08.2001 | 31.08.2006 | adm. dir |
Hans Carl Bøgh-Sørensen | 01.08.2001 | 01.08.2001 | direktion |
Birgitte Bøgh-Sørensen | 19.10.1995 | 20.09.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Christian Eberhard Groth Teisen | 05.07.2012 | 01.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Ole Ibsen | 15.04.2008 | 05.07.2012 | bestyrelse |
Hans Carl Bøgh-Sørensen | 31.08.2006 | 01.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Ole Michael Friis | 20.10.2003 | 01.04.2014 | formand |
Per Munk Laustsen | 20.10.2003 | 14.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ragnhild Birgitte Jensen | 20.10.2003 | 31.08.2006 | bestyrelse |
Hans Carl Bøgh-Sørensen | 01.08.2001 | 20.10.2003 | formand |
Niels Thorborg | 20.09.1999 | 31.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Hans Carl Bøgh-Sørensen | 20.09.1999 | 20.09.1999 | formand |
Birgitte Bøgh-Sørensen | 19.10.1995 | 20.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lennart Aure Ricard | 19.10.1995 | 20.09.1999 | bestyrelse |