Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Brian Ravn Pedersen | 01.07.1995 | 24.01.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Grodt-Andersen | 22.09.1997 | 29.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Pedersen | 09.05.1997 | 29.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Frank Hansen | 23.12.1996 | 09.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Peter Brian Ravn Pedersen | 01.07.1995 | 29.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Johanne Ravn Pedersen | 01.07.1995 | 22.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Martin Andersen | 01.07.1995 | 23.12.1996 | bestyrelse |