Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Ivar Clausen | 01.07.2007 | 31.03.2008 | direktion |
Henrik Schultze Oreskov | 23.12.1998 | 30.06.2007 | direktion |
Torben Ivar Clausen | 23.12.1998 | 28.09.1999 | direktion |
Rene Larsen | 01.04.1996 | 26.04.1999 | direktion |
Steen Krogh Hansen | 01.08.1995 | 26.04.1999 | direktion |