Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Rudolf Vester-Petersen | 24.02.1960 | 16.04.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Villy Anton Sørensen | 24.02.1960 | 16.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Christian Førland-Larsen | 24.02.1960 | 16.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henning Kristensen | 24.02.1960 | 16.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Kristensen | 24.02.1960 | 21.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Paula Judith Pedersen | 24.02.1960 | 06.05.1988 | bestyrelse |
Else Margrethe Storm Hag | 24.02.1960 | 06.05.1988 | bestyrelse |
Christian Rudolf Vester-Petersen | 24.02.1960 | 06.05.1988 | bestyrelse |