Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Johannesen | 01.06.1995 | 03.01.2011 | direktion |
Michael Prasanjit Baruah | 01.06.1995 | 13.11.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Olesen | 21.03.1996 | 03.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ole Mengel | 01.06.1995 | 03.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Johannesen | 01.06.1995 | 03.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Jonny Johannesen | 01.06.1995 | 03.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Bent Larsen | 01.06.1995 | 21.03.1996 | bestyrelse |