Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
James Rene Christensen | 18.11.1996 | 04.11.1999 | direktion |
Mariann Annita Olsen | 01.05.1995 | 18.11.1996 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.05.1995 | 04.07.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
James Rene Christensen | 18.11.1996 | 04.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Willy Sørensen Gronemann | 18.11.1996 | 01.03.1999 | bestyrelse |
Frank Rene Petersen | 18.11.1996 | 01.03.1999 | bestyrelse |
Martin Petersen | 01.05.1995 | 18.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Allan Gronemann Mortensen | 01.05.1995 | 18.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Mariann Annita Olsen | 01.05.1995 | 18.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.05.1995 | 04.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.05.1995 | 04.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.05.1995 | 04.07.1995 | bestyrelse |