Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Adnan Özari | 01.03.1998 | 01.10.2000 | direktion |
Hans Carl John Baandhøj | 01.10.1995 | 30.01.1998 | direktion |
Ulf Carl Gunnar Bohlin | 18.07.1995 | 10.10.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1995 | 18.07.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claes Peter Olof Dahlstedt | 01.07.1999 | 01.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Bo Anders Jansson | 22.07.1998 | 30.06.1999 | bestyrelse |
Adnan Özari | 01.03.1998 | 01.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Hans Carl John Baandhøj | 01.10.1995 | 30.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Lars Arne Christer Flink | 18.07.1995 | 22.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Bengt Elander | 18.07.1995 | 16.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Carl Gunnar Bohlin | 18.07.1995 | 09.01.1996 | bestyrelse |
Lars Valter Janesköld | 01.04.1995 | 01.10.2000 | bestyrelse |
Claes Wilhelm Wenthzel | 01.04.1995 | 07.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.04.1995 | 18.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1995 | 18.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.04.1995 | 18.07.1995 | formand |