Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Peter Schytte | 29.10.1998 | 10.04.2008 | direktion |
Henrik Andersen | 07.03.1995 | 29.10.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mari Anne Brüner Schytte | 29.10.1998 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Allan Aaby | 29.10.1998 | 10.04.2008 | formand |
Jeanette Aaby | 29.10.1998 | 30.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Allan Peter Schytte | 07.03.1995 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bendt Jørgensen | 07.03.1995 | 29.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Georg Pedersen | 07.03.1995 | 29.10.1998 | bestyrelse |