Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Aage Petersen | 27.01.1998 | 01.07.2003 | direktion |
Erik Ertmann Nielsen | 28.05.1996 | 27.01.1998 | direktion |
Kurt Skovlund | 01.03.1995 | 31.12.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Aage Petersen | 20.07.2000 | 01.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Bent Petersen | 20.07.2000 | 01.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lars Petersen | 20.07.2000 | 01.07.2003 | formand |
Erik Degn | 27.01.1998 | 20.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Erik Ertmann Nielsen | 28.05.1996 | 27.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Frank Ove Reite | 01.03.1995 | 20.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Kristiansen | 01.03.1995 | 27.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Skovlund | 01.03.1995 | 31.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Boe | 01.03.1995 | 31.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Erling Borcher | 01.03.1995 | 31.12.1995 | formand |