Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Buchholt Bach | 13.08.1999 | 31.12.2001 | direktion |
Knud Jensen | 02.03.1999 | 13.08.1999 | direktion |
Torsten Blichert | 20.06.1995 | 02.03.1999 | direktion |
Henning Hansen | 10.03.1995 | 07.07.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Pedersen | 03.05.2001 | 31.12.2001 | formand |
Stig Christensen | 20.05.1997 | 27.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Holck-Andersen | 20.05.1997 | 27.05.1998 | formand |
Gerd Vibeke Rahbek-Clemmensen | 20.06.1995 | 27.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Steen Juel Nielsen | 20.06.1995 | 20.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Bo Juel Nielsen | 20.06.1995 | 20.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Henning Hansen | 10.03.1995 | 07.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Tyge Jesper Rothe | 10.03.1995 | 07.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaarden | 10.03.1995 | 07.07.1995 | formand |