Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frank Johnny Hansen | 01.02.1995 | 15.01.2009 | direktion |
Lars Oluf Fogdal | 01.02.1995 | 01.07.1996 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1995 | 24.05.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Jørgen Kornerup | 19.09.1997 | 15.01.2009 | formand |
Daniel Ladegaard Kristensen | 07.03.1996 | 01.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ole Andersen | 07.03.1996 | 01.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Lars Oluf Fogdal | 01.02.1995 | 15.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Poul Henrik Tvede | 01.02.1995 | 15.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Frank Johnny Hansen | 01.02.1995 | 15.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Michael Christian Valeur Jensen | 01.02.1995 | 13.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Michael Ziegler | 01.02.1995 | 19.09.1997 | formand |
Lars Oluf Fogdal | 01.02.1995 | 01.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Zimdahl | 01.02.1995 | 07.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Allan Hugo Forfs | 01.02.1995 | 07.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jan Heggov | 01.02.1995 | 07.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.02.1995 | 24.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1995 | 24.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1995 | 24.05.1995 | formand |