Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Weisel Jensen | 12.12.2002 | 25.11.2004 | direktion |
Henrik Ramlau-Hansen | 12.12.2002 | 12.12.2002 | direktion |
Mogens Jørgensen | 08.03.1996 | 09.03.2000 | direktion |
Troels Christian Gunnergaard | 01.10.1994 | 08.03.1996 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1994 | 05.04.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Weisel Jensen | 12.12.2002 | 25.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Ramlau-Hansen | 12.12.2002 | 25.11.2004 | formand |
Inge Beicher | 11.02.2002 | 25.11.2004 | næstformand |
Olav Wilhelm Ånerud | 01.12.2000 | 12.12.2002 | formand |
Jesper Honore Winkelmann | 01.12.2000 | 11.02.2002 | næstformand |
Ulla Plesner | 01.12.2000 | 01.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Sven Erik Lystbæk | 23.08.1999 | 09.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Jørgensen | 08.03.1996 | 09.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Erik Bonnerup | 01.10.1994 | 09.03.2000 | formand |
Holger Foged | 01.10.1994 | 03.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Hans Ejvind Hansen | 01.10.1994 | 03.07.1995 | formand |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1994 | 05.04.1995 | bestyrelse |