Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Elisabeth Zeuthen Petersen | 12.08.1999 | 24.08.2001 | direktion |
Morten Victor Petersen | 12.08.1999 | 17.09.1999 | direktion |
Jan Nørgaard | 01.08.1994 | 31.08.1999 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.08.1994 | 27.12.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Elisabeth Zeuthen Petersen | 12.08.1999 | 24.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ilse Ingeborg Handrup Wilmot | 12.08.1999 | 24.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Jørgen Thomsen | 12.08.1999 | 24.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Morten Victor Petersen | 12.08.1999 | 23.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Zhao Guang Sheng | 01.08.1994 | 24.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Klaus Berning | 01.08.1994 | 31.08.1999 | bestyrelse |
Lars Phjaser-Hougaard | 01.08.1994 | 31.08.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jan Nørgaard | 01.08.1994 | 31.08.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jin Ling Cao | 01.08.1994 | 31.08.1999 | bestyrelse |
Zhao Feng Lan | 01.08.1994 | 31.08.1999 | bestyrelse |