Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mass Madsen | 01.07.1994 | 25.03.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Ruben Brage | 30.05.2003 | 25.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne John Lundt | 30.05.2003 | 20.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Preben Max Rabenhorst | 15.03.1999 | 01.06.2001 | formand |
Mads Christian Esbensen | 01.07.1994 | 25.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Mass Madsen | 01.07.1994 | 25.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jens Berg-Nielsen | 01.07.1994 | 15.03.1999 | formand |