Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lotte Jensen | 24.05.1999 | 10.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jan Juel Rasmussen | 22.06.1996 | 10.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Erik Jensen | 28.06.1994 | 10.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Morten Stern Juel Jensen | 28.06.1994 | 10.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Karl Otto Juel Rasmussen | 28.06.1994 | 10.02.2003 | bestyrelse |