Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michelle Suzanne Batt | 03.11.1999 | 09.11.2001 | direktion |
Peter Andrew Hayes | 23.05.1997 | 03.11.1999 | direktion |
Simon Mays Elsom | 01.04.1994 | 03.05.2001 | direktion |
Andrew Timothy Smith | 01.04.1994 | 23.05.1997 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.04.1994 | 24.02.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1994 | 24.02.1995 | bestyrelse |