Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Blom | 04.07.1996 | 18.09.2006 | direktion |
Poul Skovsager Larsen | 12.04.1994 | 04.07.1996 | direktion |
Peter Blom | 12.04.1994 | 04.07.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Søren Krogh | 26.11.1997 | 18.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Peter Blom | 26.11.1997 | 18.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Birgitte-Evelyn Blom | 26.11.1997 | 18.09.2006 | formand |