Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Braun Nielsen | 24.06.2009 | 09.05.2017 | direktion |
Jan Brandrup | 22.03.1994 | 24.06.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Visby Carlsen | 09.05.2011 | 09.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Klaus René Iversen | 08.07.2010 | 09.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Lars Braun Nielsen | 29.05.2009 | 09.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Charley Bertel Budtz Brandrup | 22.03.1994 | 09.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Bo Visby Carlsen | 22.03.1994 | 08.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jan Brandrup | 22.03.1994 | 29.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mikaella Helle Brandrup | 22.03.1994 | 06.07.1998 | bestyrelse |