Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Elvius Mortensen | 01.01.1994 | 14.06.2007 | direktion |
Kirsten Susanne Henriksen | 01.01.1994 | 17.11.1998 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.01.1994 | 15.09.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Palle Mortensen | 27.08.2001 | 08.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Dennis Piet Henriksen | 24.08.2000 | 14.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
John Elvius Mortensen | 08.02.2000 | 14.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Torben Thomasen | 08.02.2000 | 20.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Susanne Henriksen | 08.02.2000 | 24.08.2000 | bestyrelse |