Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Paul William Tilley | 01.02.1994 | 23.05.2000 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1994 | 28.08.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Paul Davies | 24.08.1999 | 03.09.2001 | bestyrelse |
Stig Christian Jensen | 24.08.1999 | 28.04.2000 | bestyrelse |
Torben Holm | 01.02.1994 | 03.09.2001 | bestyrelse |
Christopher Burnett Stevenson | 01.02.1994 | 03.09.2001 | bestyrelse |
Paul William Tilley | 01.02.1994 | 23.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jes Anker Mikkelsen | 01.02.1994 | 28.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Dirk Lindemann | 01.02.1994 | 24.08.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jan Nordstrøm | 01.02.1994 | 02.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Nigel Thomas Roberts | 01.02.1994 | 02.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.02.1994 | 28.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1994 | 28.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.02.1994 | 28.08.1995 | formand |