Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Ramsgaard Lilly Christensen | 01.12.1947 | 05.09.1994 | direktion |
Erik Rasmussen | 01.12.1947 | 18.07.1994 | direktion |
Bjarne Naundrup Nielsen | 01.12.1947 | 08.02.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Ramsgaard Lilly Christensen | 01.12.1947 | 05.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Poul Erik Rasmussen | 01.12.1947 | 05.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Høgdahl Jensen | 01.12.1947 | 05.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Rasmussen | 01.12.1947 | 18.07.1994 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Naundrup Nielsen | 01.12.1947 | 08.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jytte Hougs Nielsen | 01.12.1947 | 08.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Dorthe Naundrup Hansen | 01.12.1947 | 08.02.1993 | bestyrelse |