Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Salicath | 01.12.1993 | 30.11.1995 | direktion |
Johannus Gunnar Egholm Hansen | 01.12.1993 | 29.12.1994 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.12.1993 | 07.06.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Jybæk | 01.12.1993 | 30.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Stig Thomsen | 01.12.1993 | 30.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Janne Groth | 01.12.1993 | 30.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Torben Holm | 01.12.1993 | 29.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.12.1993 | 07.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 01.12.1993 | 07.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaardboe Bertelsen | 01.12.1993 | 07.06.1994 | formand |