Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
René Asger Otto Wiuff Andersen | 21.02.2011 | 21.06.2011 | adm. dir |
Michael Ørsted | 13.05.2005 | 21.02.2011 | direktion |
René Asger Otto Wiuff Andersen | 01.12.1993 | 31.10.2004 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1993 | 03.03.1994 | direktion |