Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Frank Fredskilde | 01.11.1993 | 11.06.1999 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1993 | 16.06.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Horn Andersen | 01.11.1993 | 06.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Poul Frank Fredskilde | 01.11.1993 | 06.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ole Hjorth Christiansen | 01.11.1993 | 06.09.1994 | bestyrelse |