Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Aage Dam | 01.01.2012 | 04.02.2015 | adm. dir |
Lars Bertil Larsson | 03.08.2002 | 31.12.2011 | direktion |
Heribert Peter Hans Rohrbeck | 02.08.2002 | 03.08.2002 | direktion |
Niels Michael Jakobsen | 30.09.1998 | 27.05.2002 | direktion |
Jens Kurt Christian Pedersen | 18.06.1993 | 30.09.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Markus Dietschi | 29.05.2014 | 04.02.2015 | bestyrelse |
Heribert Peter Hans Rohrbeck | 29.05.2014 | 04.02.2015 | formand |
Rune Tarnø | 08.07.2008 | 04.02.2015 | bestyrelse |
Niels Michael Jakobsen | 30.09.1998 | 27.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jeffrey Peter Galmond | 18.06.1993 | 08.07.2008 | bestyrelse |
Walter Kreis | 18.06.1993 | 15.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jens Kurt Christian Pedersen | 18.06.1993 | 30.09.1998 | bestyrelse |