Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Einar Reinhardt Nielsen | 05.10.1998 | 01.06.2004 | direktion |
Astor Henrik Glipstrup | 01.09.1993 | 05.10.1998 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1993 | 15.12.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Reinhardt Nielsen | 01.02.2002 | 01.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Grete Helmark | 05.10.1998 | 01.06.2004 | formand |
Einar Reinhardt Nielsen | 01.09.1993 | 01.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Astor Henrik Glipstrup | 01.09.1993 | 01.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Iris Ragnhild Glipstrup | 01.09.1993 | 05.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.09.1993 | 15.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1993 | 15.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.09.1993 | 15.12.1993 | formand |