Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Munk | 01.09.2008 | 21.01.2009 | direktion |
Brian Søholt Petersen | 01.01.2008 | 01.09.2008 | direktion |
Hugo Christian Svaneeng | 30.04.1993 | 01.01.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brian Søholt Petersen | 12.12.2006 | 21.01.2009 | bestyrelse |
Steen Bryde | 12.12.2006 | 21.01.2009 | formand |
Michael Ziegler | 12.12.2006 | 18.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Ole Bay Esbensen | 20.01.2000 | 12.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Hugo Christian Svaneeng | 07.10.1997 | 30.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Vick | 07.10.1997 | 06.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Tina Palm | 07.10.1997 | 20.01.2000 | bestyrelse |