Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Brøns Buhl | 07.10.2019 | 09.03.2020 | direktør |
Bent Tranholm Jensen | 01.05.1993 | 07.10.2019 | direktion |
Anne-Marie Jensen | 01.05.1993 | 21.12.1998 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.05.1993 | 01.10.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Nicolaisen | 01.01.2019 | 09.03.2020 | formand |
Jane Petersen | 01.01.2013 | 09.03.2020 | bestyrelse |
Søren Nielsen | 01.10.2002 | 09.03.2020 | bestyrelse |
Torben Dalby Larsen | 01.10.2002 | 31.12.2018 | formand |
Ellen Louise Iversen | 01.10.2002 | 01.01.2013 | bestyrelse |